Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Niels Bjørn Struve | 23.12.2008 | 04.11.2011 | direktion |
Peter Borre Møller | 28.02.2008 | 23.12.2008 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Peter Borre Møller | 28.02.2008 | 23.12.2008 | bestyrelse |
Peder Michael Hauch | 28.02.2008 | 23.12.2008 | bestyrelse |
Peter Schäfer | 28.02.2008 | 07.11.2008 | formand |