Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Lene Jelsbech | 08.02.2008 | 28.01.2015 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Alex Schmidt Jensen | 09.09.2010 | 28.01.2015 | formand |
Alvin Lee Kuiper | 23.04.2010 | 28.01.2015 | bestyrelse |
Henrik Bülow | 23.04.2010 | 09.09.2010 | formand |
Finn Palle Jensen | 08.02.2008 | 23.04.2010 | formand |
Lene Jelsbech | 08.02.2008 | 13.11.2009 | bestyrelse |