Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Kirsten Bertelsen | 11.02.2008 | 22.10.2015 | direktion |
Tine Nygaard Jensen | 11.02.2008 | 31.12.2011 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Tine Nygaard Jensen | 09.01.2009 | 31.12.2011 | bestyrelse |
Kirsten Bertelsen | 09.01.2009 | 31.12.2011 | bestyrelse |
Ole Juul Møller | 09.01.2009 | 31.12.2011 | formand |