Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Brian Icedor Petersen | 20.03.2012 | 09.03.2018 | adm. dir |
Andreas Trojel Kloster | 23.03.2011 | 20.03.2012 | direktion |
Morten Frydensbjerg | 23.03.2011 | 20.03.2012 | direktion |
Michael Pihl Wallin | 29.10.2009 | 29.10.2009 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jens Runeborg | 29.10.2009 | 23.03.2011 | bestyrelse |
Morten Frydensbjerg | 29.10.2009 | 23.03.2011 | bestyrelse |
Andreas Trojel Kloster | 29.10.2009 | 23.03.2011 | formand |