Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Bob Janssen | 01.07.2010 | 18.06.2013 | direktion |
Klaus Peter Besier | 01.07.2010 | 18.06.2013 | adm. dir |
Hans Middelburg | 24.09.2009 | 01.07.2010 | adm. dir |
Erik Jacques Biekart | 08.02.2008 | 01.07.2010 | direktion |
Timo Victor Norman Roland Bosma | 08.02.2008 | 26.06.2009 | adm. dir |
Peter Andreas Stakemann | 01.01.2008 | 08.02.2008 | direktion |