Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Djonny Hjøllund Sørensen | 31.03.2009 | 16.02.2016 | direktion |
Olav Gjørup | 13.12.2007 | 31.03.2009 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Lars Erlandsen Christoffersen | 23.06.2014 | 16.02.2016 | bestyrelse |
Thorstein Folke Hansen | 23.06.2014 | 16.02.2016 | formand |
Svend Gramstrup | 19.04.2012 | 23.06.2014 | bestyrelse |
Djonny Hjøllund Sørensen | 31.03.2009 | 16.02.2016 | bestyrelse |
Olav Gjørup | 31.03.2009 | 23.06.2014 | formand |
Ulla Holm Gjørup | 13.12.2007 | 19.04.2012 | bestyrelse |