Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Thomas Philip Kirshaw Rooke | 06.12.2017 | 12.06.2018 | adm. dir |
Gavin David O'Dowd | 04.01.2017 | 06.12.2017 | adm. dir |
Rajiv Kumar Gupta | 11.04.2014 | 04.01.2017 | direktion |
Lars Inge Wallentin Björkholm | 27.03.2008 | 04.01.2017 | direktion |
Lars Inge Wallentin Björkholm | 18.12.2007 | 27.03.2008 | direktion |
Peter Andreas Stakemann | 28.11.2007 | 18.12.2007 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Thomas Philip Kirshaw Rooke | 04.01.2017 | 12.06.2018 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Peter Helbo Jørgensen | 04.01.2017 | 12.06.2018 | formand |
Rasmus Thykjær Pagh | 04.01.2017 | 28.03.2018 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Gavin David O'Dowd | 04.01.2017 | 06.12.2017 | bestyrelsesmedlem |