Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jan Tornfeldt | 16.11.2007 | 20.11.2009 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Odd Lyder Johnsen | 16.11.2007 | 20.11.2009 | bestyrelse |
Jan Tornfeldt | 16.11.2007 | 20.11.2009 | bestyrelse |
Niels Baht | 16.11.2007 | 20.11.2009 | formand |
Peter Francis Bowsted | 16.11.2007 | 01.06.2009 | bestyrelse |
Niels Brix | 16.11.2007 | 03.04.2008 | bestyrelse |