Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Axel Skylv | 13.11.1943 | 11.06.1998 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Finn Sehested | 03.11.1997 | 11.06.1998 | bestyrelse |
Preben Thomasen | 03.11.1997 | 11.06.1998 | bestyrelse |
Peer Immanuel Johan Voigt | 03.11.1997 | 11.06.1998 | formand |
Kurt Skovlund | 05.03.1997 | 05.03.1997 | bestyrelse |
Peter Guldager Christiansen | 07.06.1994 | 03.11.1997 | bestyrelse |
Leif Anders Olsen | 07.06.1994 | 03.11.1997 | formand |
Anton Peder Mølgaard Sørensen | 28.04.1994 | 11.06.1998 | bestyrelse |
Pia Vilhelmsen | 28.04.1994 | 11.06.1998 | personlig_suppleant |
Birthe Groth | 28.04.1994 | 11.06.1998 | personlig_suppleant |
Frantz Palludan | 20.08.1992 | 07.06.1994 | bestyrelse |
Jens Vilhelm Madsen | 13.11.1943 | 11.06.1998 | bestyrelse |
Axel Skylv | 13.11.1943 | 03.11.1997 | bestyrelse |
Steen Kønigsfeldt | 13.11.1943 | 05.03.1997 | bestyrelse |
Steen Bjerg | 13.11.1943 | 28.04.1994 | bestyrelse |
Kaj Aage Madsen | 13.11.1943 | 28.04.1994 | personlig_suppleant |
Jens Erik Knudsen | 13.11.1943 | 28.04.1994 | personlig_suppleant |
Jørn Kofoed | 13.11.1943 | 04.01.1994 | formand |
Erling Holmbjerg Jensen | 13.11.1943 | 17.02.1993 | bestyrelse |
Enver Edwin Medjedovic Hansen | 13.11.1943 | 20.08.1992 | bestyrelse |
Vibeke Lisbeth Egede Haume | 13.11.1943 | 27.08.1991 | bestyrelse |
Hans Juul Jensen | 13.11.1943 | 27.08.1991 | bestyrelse |
Elvin Ingvard Peter Karl Pedersen | 13.11.1943 | 27.08.1991 | bestyrelse |
Johan Hansen | 13.11.1943 | 11.06.1990 | bestyrelse |
Kaj Nielsen | 13.11.1943 | 11.06.1990 | bestyrelse |
Karl Kristian Nielsen | 13.11.1943 | 11.06.1990 | personlig_suppleant |