Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Ulrik Beck Kannegaard | 10.01.2017 | 24.05.2017 | adm. dir |
Carl Peter Serena Westphal Møller | 01.03.2012 | 10.01.2017 | adm. dir |
Henrik Bo Zinck | 31.12.2007 | 31.12.2011 | adm. dir |
Morten Hald | 25.10.2007 | 31.12.2007 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Helle Andersen | 30.04.2017 | 24.05.2017 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Michael Moesgaard Andersen | 30.04.2017 | 24.05.2017 | formand |
Ulrik Beck Kannegaard | 10.01.2017 | 24.05.2017 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Carl Peter Serena Westphal Møller | 10.01.2017 | 30.04.2017 | formand |
Carl Peter Serena Westphal Møller | 29.10.2012 | 09.01.2017 | bestyrelse |
Søren Elmann Ingerslev | 28.11.2008 | 10.01.2017 | formand |
Michael Moesgaard Andersen | 25.10.2007 | 29.04.2017 | bestyrelse |
Henrik Bo Zinck | 25.10.2007 | 29.10.2012 | bestyrelse |
Frank Jensen | 25.10.2007 | 28.11.2008 | formand |