Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Camilla Gesina Blok | 01.06.2012 | 03.07.2012 | adm. dir |
Karin Repstock-Romme | 24.10.2011 | 19.12.2011 | direktion |
Betina Brøndum | 01.09.2011 | 01.06.2012 | direktion |
Camilla Gesina Blok | 03.12.2010 | 24.10.2011 | direktion |
Pia Mia Siska Joensen | 20.08.2007 | 03.12.2010 | direktion |
Dyveke Leegaard Angelo | 20.08.2007 | 03.12.2010 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Camilla Gesina Blok | 19.12.2011 | 01.06.2012 | personlig_suppleant |