Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Steen Aalund Olsen | 21.11.2011 | 04.10.2014 | direktion |
Christian Grønlykke | 12.08.2008 | 21.11.2011 | direktion |
Henning Biil | 10.07.2008 | 12.08.2008 | direktion |
Victor Christoffersen | 01.07.2007 | 10.07.2008 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Steen Aalund Olsen | 21.11.2011 | 04.10.2014 | bestyrelse |
Mikael Grønlykke | 12.08.2008 | 04.10.2014 | bestyrelse |
Jacob Grønlykke | 12.08.2008 | 04.10.2014 | bestyrelse |
Christian Grønlykke | 12.08.2008 | 21.11.2011 | bestyrelse |
Henning Biil | 10.07.2008 | 12.08.2008 | bestyrelse |
Kristina Skalberg Sejersen | 10.07.2008 | 12.08.2008 | formand |
Helen Mimi Janniche | 01.07.2007 | 12.08.2008 | bestyrelse |
Victor Christoffersen | 01.07.2007 | 10.07.2008 | bestyrelse |
Sebastian Benjamin Bahn Christoffersen | 01.07.2007 | 10.07.2008 | bestyrelse |