Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Steffen Bryndum | 14.06.2007 | 01.09.2010 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Ingolf Johannes Bryndum | 16.03.2010 | 01.09.2010 | formand |
Henrik Kaae | 02.12.2009 | 01.09.2010 | bestyrelse |
Lars Sendal From | 05.10.2009 | 16.03.2010 | formand |
Kim Sørensen | 05.10.2009 | 02.12.2009 | bestyrelse |
Steffen Bryndum | 14.06.2007 | 01.09.2010 | bestyrelse |
Klavs Pedersen | 14.06.2007 | 05.10.2009 | bestyrelse |
Maiken Bested | 14.06.2007 | 05.10.2009 | bestyrelse |