Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Bent Pedersen | 25.11.2008 | 17.06.2010 | bestyrelse |
Anni Pedersen | 25.11.2008 | 17.06.2010 | bestyrelse |
Mogens Christensen | 25.11.2008 | 17.06.2010 | formand |
Vicki Smed Jensen | 12.09.2007 | 17.06.2010 | bestyrelse |
Jan Hartmann Andersen | 12.09.2007 | 10.11.2008 | formand |
Allan Pedersen | 23.05.2007 | 17.06.2010 | bestyrelse |
Bjarne August Fog | 23.05.2007 | 10.11.2008 | bestyrelse |
Jesper Haagen | 23.05.2007 | 10.11.2008 | bestyrelse |
Bent Pedersen | 23.05.2007 | 12.09.2007 | bestyrelse |