Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Alex Andreas Lehmberg | 01.06.2007 | 15.10.2008 | direktion |
Martin Nebelong Vidiendal Olsen | 01.06.2007 | 15.10.2008 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Poul Erik Dige | 01.11.2007 | 15.10.2008 | bestyrelse |
Peter Dam-Johnsen | 01.11.2007 | 15.10.2008 | bestyrelse |
Niels Vejrup Carlsen | 01.11.2007 | 15.10.2008 | formand |
Jens Ove Albertsen | 18.07.2007 | 01.11.2007 | bestyrelse |
Alex Andreas Lehmberg | 01.06.2007 | 15.10.2008 | bestyrelse |
Martin Nebelong Vidiendal Olsen | 01.06.2007 | 01.11.2007 | bestyrelse |