Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jørgen Vagn Thomsen | 17.07.2007 | 01.12.2011 | direktion |
Ole Lewis Mortensen | 30.03.2007 | 17.07.2007 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jens Rytter | 01.02.2011 | 01.12.2011 | bestyrelse |
Peter Asboe | 13.03.2009 | 01.12.2011 | formand |
Jens Edvard Jakobsson | 13.03.2009 | 01.12.2011 | næstformand |
Claes Leisgaard Graff | 13.03.2009 | 01.02.2011 | bestyrelse |
Mads Peter Arndal-Lauritzen | 17.07.2007 | 13.03.2009 | formand |
Leif Brandt | 17.07.2007 | 20.02.2008 | næstformand |
Steen Steensen | 30.03.2007 | 17.07.2007 | bestyrelse |
Sonny Hoffmann Nielsen | 30.03.2007 | 17.07.2007 | bestyrelse |
Ole Lewis Mortensen | 30.03.2007 | 17.07.2007 | bestyrelse |