Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Freddy Alex Claesen | 23.05.2007 | 09.10.2020 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Christian Krogh | 23.12.2016 | 09.10.2020 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Henrietta Haukrogh | 23.12.2016 | 09.10.2020 | formand |
Anne Christina Claesen | 23.05.2008 | 23.12.2016 | bestyrelse |
Freddy Alex Claesen | 23.05.2007 | 09.10.2020 | bestyrelse |
Peter Alex Claesen | 23.05.2007 | 23.12.2016 | formand |
Lene Claesen | 23.05.2007 | 23.05.2008 | bestyrelse |