Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Carl Johan Kördel | 31.03.2008 | 05.02.2010 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Lars Hellerung Christiansen | 12.08.2009 | 05.02.2010 | bestyrelse |
Peter Moldt | 12.08.2009 | 05.02.2010 | formand |
Peter Finsel Bisgaard | 05.01.2009 | 05.02.2010 | bestyrelse |
Michael Bart Sheffery | 05.01.2009 | 05.02.2010 | bestyrelse |
John Bondo Hansen | 31.03.2008 | 05.02.2010 | bestyrelse |
Mikael Søndergaard Thomsen | 31.03.2008 | 05.02.2010 | bestyrelse |
Carl Johan Kördel | 31.03.2008 | 05.02.2010 | bestyrelse |
Anker Jon Hansen | 31.03.2008 | 05.01.2009 | bestyrelse |