Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Stig Jan Wandrup | 09.03.2007 | 03.03.2009 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Stig Jan Wandrup | 09.03.2007 | 03.03.2009 | bestyrelse |
Kirsten Schiersing | 09.03.2007 | 28.11.2008 | bestyrelse |
Jakob Mogens Evart | 09.03.2007 | 27.11.2008 | bestyrelse |