Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Marc Förstemann | 04.02.2008 | 13.03.2009 | adm. dir |
Hamish Nihal Malmcolm De Run | 15.03.2007 | 04.02.2008 | adm. dir |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Lesley Ann Jones | 31.05.2008 | 13.03.2009 | bestyrelse |
Mark Alan McClain | 04.02.2008 | 13.03.2009 | bestyrelse |
Michael Adelsten Olsen | 04.02.2008 | 13.03.2009 | formand |
Rabih Issam Khoury | 15.03.2007 | 31.05.2008 | bestyrelse |
Kjeld Binger | 15.03.2007 | 04.02.2008 | formand |