Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Peter Mietkiewicz Kolos | 21.03.2007 | 07.09.2010 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Peter Mietkiewicz Kolos | 21.03.2007 | 07.09.2010 | bestyrelse |
Michael Tang Hartmann | 21.03.2007 | 28.05.2009 | bestyrelse |
Michael Tesone | 21.03.2007 | 07.01.2008 | bestyrelse |