Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Mihriban Hakbilen | 12.02.2008 | 02.02.2009 | adm. dir |
Süleyman Ozdemir | 18.09.2007 | 12.02.2008 | adm. dir |
Hasan Solakli | 15.06.2007 | 18.09.2007 | direktion |
Alan Victor Bulut | 15.06.2007 | 18.09.2007 | direktion |
Fikret Oztürk | 15.06.2007 | 18.09.2007 | direktion |
Peter Andreas Stakemann | 13.02.2007 | 15.06.2007 | direktion |