Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Helge Schou | 18.03.1976 | 12.05.2004 | direktion |
Thomas Munch | 18.03.1976 | 12.05.2004 | adm. dir |
John Krogh | 18.03.1976 | 30.09.2002 | direktion |
Cedric Timothy Ellison | 18.03.1976 | 30.09.2002 | direktion |
Pia Schou | 18.03.1976 | 16.12.1996 | direktion |
Bjarne Glintborg Christensen | 18.03.1976 | 21.09.1989 | direktion |
Gudrun Kathrine Christensen | 18.03.1976 | 21.09.1989 | direktion |