Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Horst-Werner Johann Knüppel | 23.04.2014 | 24.02.2017 | bestyrelse |
Kim Bomholt | 20.06.2013 | 24.02.2017 | bestyrelse |
Bjarke Gohr Jensen | 13.03.2012 | 24.02.2017 | formand |
Peter Stefan Schou | 13.03.2012 | 23.04.2014 | bestyrelse |
Jan Dahlgaard | 13.03.2012 | 20.06.2013 | bestyrelse |
Kim Bomholt | 13.03.2012 | 13.03.2012 | bestyrelse |
Søren Lindemann | 08.04.2011 | 13.03.2012 | bestyrelse |
Lars Kolind | 20.05.2009 | 08.04.2011 | bestyrelse |
Bettina Krumbæk Trenckner | 29.05.2008 | 08.04.2011 | formand |
Horst-Werner Johann Knüppel | 29.05.2008 | 27.05.2010 | bestyrelse |
Kim Bomholt | 29.05.2008 | 20.05.2009 | formand |
Henrik Steffan Frost Mensch | 11.12.2006 | 29.05.2008 | bestyrelse |