Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Gunnar Petersen | 01.04.2014 | 11.02.2016 | adm. dir |
Ole Sølvsten Hemmingsen | 01.11.2010 | 01.04.2014 | adm. dir |
Henrik Basso Reichsthaler Møller | 01.11.2010 | 01.11.2010 | adm. dir |
Ole Sølvsten Hemmingsen | 19.01.2009 | 01.11.2010 | adm. dir |
Christian Bruun | 16.10.2006 | 19.01.2009 | adm. dir |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Gunnar Petersen | 01.04.2014 | 11.02.2016 | bestyrelse |
Þór Konráðsson | 01.04.2014 | 11.02.2016 | bestyrelse |
Finnur Oddsson | 01.04.2014 | 11.02.2016 | formand |
Ágúst Einarsson | 13.02.2013 | 01.04.2014 | bestyrelse |
Rasmus Maahr | 14.05.2008 | 01.04.2014 | bestyrelse |
Hinrik Andrés Hansen | 16.10.2006 | 01.04.2014 | formand |
Per Falck Jensen | 16.10.2006 | 13.02.2013 | bestyrelse |
Jacob Mørck | 16.10.2006 | 14.05.2008 | bestyrelse |