Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Erik Friedlænder | 22.03.2011 | 16.10.2014 | direktion |
Henrik Bender Bendixen | 03.02.2007 | 22.03.2011 | direktion |
Erik Friedlænder | 01.10.2006 | 03.02.2007 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Ole Pedersen | 09.02.2013 | 15.03.2014 | bestyrelse |
Søren Vang Hansen | 09.02.2013 | 15.03.2014 | formand |
Troels Aagaard | 08.06.2012 | 09.02.2013 | bestyrelse |
Bjørn Michael Bengtsson | 22.06.2009 | 08.06.2012 | bestyrelse |
Henrik Bender Bendixen | 03.02.2007 | 22.06.2009 | bestyrelse |
Erik Friedlænder | 01.10.2006 | 15.03.2014 | bestyrelse |
Birger Kuntkes | 01.10.2006 | 09.02.2013 | bestyrelse |
Bjørn Michael Bengtsson | 01.10.2006 | 03.02.2007 | bestyrelse |