Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Nicolaj Ryberg Madsen | 29.11.2019 | 19.06.2023 | adm. dir |
Kjeld Qvistgaard Jensen | 05.01.2017 | 29.11.2019 | adm. dir |
Nicolaj Ryberg Madsen | 15.01.2013 | 30.11.2016 | adm. dir |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Kurt Erik Hansen | 05.01.2017 | 23.02.2018 | formand |
Erik Jørgensen | 09.02.2016 | 23.02.2018 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Kjeld Qvistgaard Jensen | 21.01.2014 | 23.02.2018 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Kurt Erik Hansen | 21.01.2014 | 04.01.2017 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Brian Jensen | 31.05.2012 | 23.02.2018 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Jens Peter Skovgaard | 31.05.2012 | 30.11.2016 | formand |
Ole Kokborg Pedersen | 31.05.2012 | 09.02.2016 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Jørgen Bertelsen Holst | 31.05.2012 | 21.01.2014 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Susanne Ryberg | 31.05.2012 | 21.01.2014 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Henriette Daugaard Petersen | 26.09.2006 | 31.05.2012 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Anders Christiansen | 26.09.2006 | 31.05.2012 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Bent Lildholdt Rytz | 26.09.2006 | 31.05.2012 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Freddie Kupper | 26.09.2006 | 31.05.2012 | formand |