Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Lone Bidstrup Tikkanen | 31.08.2009 | 07.01.2010 | direktion |
Stefan Hansen | 16.02.2007 | 31.08.2009 | adm. dir |
Peter Walter Klein | 23.08.2006 | 12.09.2007 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Lene Aagaard Lindebjerg | 03.11.2008 | 31.08.2009 | formand |
Lone Bidstrup Tikkanen | 12.09.2007 | 31.08.2009 | bestyrelse |
Stefan Hansen | 12.09.2007 | 31.08.2009 | bestyrelse |
Sven Björck | 12.09.2007 | 03.11.2008 | formand |
Peter Walter Klein | 12.09.2007 | 29.04.2008 | bestyrelse |
Hans Göran Paul Ahlström | 12.09.2007 | 12.09.2007 | bestyrelse |