Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Tonny Skarby | 03.10.2006 | 01.09.2008 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Bent Thorsted | 14.02.2008 | 01.09.2008 | bestyrelse |
Frank Jensen | 14.02.2008 | 26.08.2008 | bestyrelse |
Thomas Vang Christensen | 25.06.2007 | 14.02.2008 | bestyrelse |
Tonny Skarby | 03.10.2006 | 01.09.2008 | bestyrelse |
Christian Petri | 03.10.2006 | 14.02.2008 | formand |
Per Eriksen | 03.10.2006 | 25.06.2007 | bestyrelse |