Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Kurt Kvorning | 01.10.1970 | 04.08.1994 | direktion |
Mogens Woergaard Mikkelsen | 01.10.1970 | 02.12.1991 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Kurt Kvorning | 01.10.1970 | 04.08.1994 | bestyrelse |
Lisbet Kvorning | 01.10.1970 | 04.08.1994 | bestyrelse |
Christian Kvorning | 01.10.1970 | 04.08.1994 | bestyrelse |
Bent Kaiser | 01.10.1970 | 02.12.1991 | bestyrelse |
John Børs Vabø | 01.10.1970 | 02.12.1991 | bestyrelse |
Inge Randi Hansen | 01.10.1970 | 02.12.1991 | suppleant |
Karoly Laszlo Nemeth | 01.10.1970 | 12.09.1990 | bestyrelse |