Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Anders Sloth Christensen | 23.06.2009 | 25.02.2011 | direktion |
Jens Støttrup | 02.11.2006 | 22.06.2009 | direktion |
Anders Sloth Christensen | 06.09.2006 | 02.11.2006 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jens Støttrup | 02.11.2006 | 25.02.2011 | bestyrelse |
Jacob Frost Christensen | 02.11.2006 | 25.02.2011 | formand |
Anders Sloth Christensen | 06.09.2006 | 25.02.2011 | bestyrelse |