Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Michael Max Nielsen | 28.12.2006 | 11.08.2017 | direktion |
Christian Søndergaard | 28.12.2006 | 11.08.2017 | adm. dir |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Andreas Borreskov Iversen | 28.10.2011 | 08.10.2012 | bestyrelse |
Tim Frank Andersen | 28.10.2011 | 08.10.2012 | formand |
Christian Søndergaard | 28.12.2006 | 11.08.2017 | bestyrelse |
Michael Max Nielsen | 28.12.2006 | 11.08.2017 | bestyrelse |
Dan Schou | 28.12.2006 | 26.03.2010 | bestyrelse |
Ulrich Schmidt | 28.12.2006 | 26.03.2010 | formand |