Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Hauke Niehus | 03.12.2012 | 14.11.2016 | direktion |
Henning Baltzer | 21.12.2006 | 03.12.2012 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Armin Peter Federer | 30.01.2013 | 14.11.2016 | bestyrelse |
Hauke Niehus | 03.12.2012 | 14.11.2016 | bestyrelse |
Thomas Wagner | 03.12.2012 | 14.11.2016 | formand |
Bernd Schewior | 21.12.2006 | 30.01.2013 | bestyrelse |
Dieter Peter Pesch | 21.12.2006 | 03.12.2012 | bestyrelse |
Hans Hässig | 21.12.2006 | 03.12.2012 | formand |