Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Niels Jørgen Rohde Olsen | 11.03.2019 | 20.08.2019 | adm. dir |
Thomas Torre Christiansen | 12.09.2018 | 11.03.2019 | adm. dir |
Niels Jørgen Rohde Olsen | 12.10.2012 | 12.09.2018 | direktion |
Niels Jørgen Rohde Olsen | 07.11.2006 | 01.11.2012 | direktion |