Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jing Lin | 31.08.2016 | 04.09.2020 | direktør |
Sheng Juan Du | 04.08.2014 | 31.08.2016 | direktion |
Duoyan Zhang | 04.03.2014 | 04.08.2014 | direktion |
Jianwei Qiu | 21.11.2013 | 04.03.2014 | direktion |
Xinwang He | 18.10.2013 | 21.11.2013 | adm. dir |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Duoyan Zhang | 04.08.2014 | 31.10.2014 | suppleant |