Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Ole Toft | 01.08.2010 | 17.06.2010 | direktion |
Lars Weber | 17.06.2010 | 04.12.2017 | adm. dir |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Anders Jensen | 25.02.2014 | 04.12.2017 | formand |
Ole Toft | 01.08.2010 | 25.02.2014 | formand |
Preben Mortensen Vinther | 24.04.2008 | 17.06.2010 | bestyrelse |
Peder Næsborg | 18.12.2006 | 04.12.2017 | bestyrelse |
Knud Andersen | 18.12.2006 | 04.12.2017 | bestyrelse |