Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Henrik Nielsen | 19.03.2015 | 13.04.2020 | direktør |
Rikke Sonne | 13.10.2013 | 19.03.2015 | adm. dir |
Henrik Nielsen | 24.03.2013 | 13.10.2013 | adm. dir |
Geo Vannini Lazarotti | 08.09.2006 | 24.03.2013 | direktion |
Jørgen Herman Melchior | 18.08.2006 | 08.09.2006 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jesper Christensen | 08.09.2006 | 24.03.2013 | bestyrelse |
Geo Vannini Lazarotti | 08.09.2006 | 24.03.2013 | bestyrelse |
Henrik Nielsen | 08.09.2006 | 24.03.2013 | formand |
Stephen Paul Juul Jensen | 08.09.2006 | 29.05.2007 | bestyrelse |
Peter Andreas Stakemann | 18.08.2006 | 08.09.2006 | bestyrelse |