Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Lars Terje Schive | 25.09.2006 | 19.06.2009 | direktion |
Jørgen Herman Melchior | 18.08.2006 | 25.09.2006 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Lars Terje Schive | 25.09.2006 | 19.06.2009 | bestyrelse |
Bo Ablo-Nielsen | 25.09.2006 | 19.06.2009 | bestyrelse |
Kenneth Soldal | 25.09.2006 | 28.04.2008 | formand |
Peter Andreas Stakemann | 18.08.2006 | 25.09.2006 | formand |