Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Pernille Ohlsen | 26.08.2015 | 28.09.2016 | adm. dir |
Bertil Bak Wogensen | 03.12.2014 | 26.08.2015 | adm. dir |
Michael Hansen | 01.09.2007 | 03.12.2014 | direktion |
Victor Christoffersen | 01.07.2006 | 11.06.2007 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Bertil Bak Wogensen | 08.11.2013 | 03.12.2014 | formand |
Søren Søgaard | 29.08.2012 | 03.12.2014 | bestyrelse |
Margit Solveig Ulrika Winkler | 29.08.2012 | 08.11.2013 | formand |
Michael Hansen | 09.03.2009 | 03.12.2014 | bestyrelse |
Jesper Holm Nielsen | 11.06.2007 | 04.03.2010 | bestyrelse |
Bertil Bak Wogensen | 11.06.2007 | 09.03.2009 | bestyrelse |