Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Bent Alsø | 29.12.2015 | 04.09.2018 | adm. dir |
Carsten Gøtze Dyberg | 01.07.2006 | 29.12.2015 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Carsten Wøhlk Lauritsen | 01.07.2013 | 29.12.2015 | bestyrelse |
Klavs Breckling | 01.07.2013 | 29.12.2015 | bestyrelse |
Anne Brit Clausen | 30.06.2013 | 01.07.2013 | bestyrelse |
Bent Alsø | 01.07.2006 | 04.09.2018 | formand |
Carsten Gøtze Dyberg | 01.07.2006 | 29.12.2015 | bestyrelse |
Janet Alsø | 01.07.2006 | 30.06.2013 | bestyrelse |