Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Johnnie Lønbirk | 24.06.2010 | 29.04.2013 | direktion |
Henning Bjerregaard Lønbirk | 03.01.2008 | 24.06.2010 | direktion |
Kim Nedergaard Staal | 10.07.2006 | 03.01.2008 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Thomas Lønbirk | 24.06.2010 | 29.04.2013 | formand |
Johnnie Lønbirk | 03.01.2008 | 29.04.2013 | bestyrelse |
Ole Stouby Vesterdahl | 03.01.2008 | 29.04.2013 | bestyrelse |
Jens Hjorth Christophersen | 10.07.2006 | 24.06.2010 | bestyrelse |
Henning Bjerregaard Lønbirk | 10.07.2006 | 24.06.2010 | bestyrelse |
Kim Nedergaard Staal | 10.07.2006 | 03.01.2008 | bestyrelse |