Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Güner Iljazovski Milberg | 14.01.2008 | 01.12.2010 | adm. dir |
Christian Møjen Toft | 12.07.2006 | 14.01.2008 | direktion |
Güner Iljazovski Milberg | 12.07.2006 | 20.08.2007 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Güner Iljazovski Milberg | 14.01.2008 | 01.12.2010 | formand |