Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Saqib Hussain Shah | 18.06.2010 | 18.08.2012 | direktion |
Raheela Shafqat Shah | 07.04.2010 | 18.06.2010 | direktion |
Saqib Hussain Shah | 20.10.2009 | 07.04.2010 | direktion |
Ryan Cagara Hansen | 05.05.2009 | 16.09.2009 | direktion |
Saqib Hussain Shah | 20.05.2008 | 05.05.2009 | direktion |
Ryan Cagara Hansen | 09.05.2008 | 20.05.2008 | direktion |
Jan Lalani | 09.05.2008 | 20.05.2008 | direktion |
Saqib Hussain Shah | 03.07.2006 | 09.05.2008 | direktion |