Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Andreas Christian Petersen | 30.06.2006 | 15.07.2019 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jens Højgaard Christoffersen | 03.04.2014 | 15.07.2019 | bestyrelse |
Peter Hostrup Rasmussen | 03.04.2014 | 15.07.2019 | bestyrelse |
Michael Bindseil | 03.04.2014 | 15.07.2019 | formand |
Sten Christian Hansen | 24.09.2012 | 03.04.2014 | bestyrelse |
Andreas Christian Petersen | 30.06.2006 | 03.04.2014 | bestyrelse |
Linda Pagaard Flugt Petersen | 30.06.2006 | 03.04.2014 | formand |
Leo Nørgaard | 30.06.2006 | 24.09.2012 | bestyrelse |