Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Kurt Poulsen | 15.05.2009 | 04.11.2009 | bestyrelse |
Henrik Hoffmann | 15.05.2009 | 04.11.2009 | bestyrelse |
Walter Pieter de Boer | 05.02.2009 | 15.05.2009 | bestyrelse |
Jan Aage Rasmussen | 13.11.2006 | 15.05.2009 | bestyrelse |
Bo Boulund Knudsen | 31.05.2006 | 04.11.2009 | bestyrelse |
Eelke Hendrik Paul Siersema | 31.05.2006 | 05.02.2009 | bestyrelse |
Knud Erik Juul Larsen | 31.05.2006 | 13.11.2006 | bestyrelse |