Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Claus Cornelius Woldbye | 07.03.2011 | 31.10.2015 | direktion |
Henrik Lund-Nielsen | 08.06.2006 | 09.01.2017 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Peter Søderberg Krogh | 28.02.2011 | 04.01.2017 | bestyrelse |
Christian Henri Leroy | 28.02.2011 | 04.01.2017 | bestyrelse |
Henrik Lund-Nielsen | 28.02.2011 | 04.01.2017 | bestyrelse |
Knud Carsten Bernhard Lønfeldt | 28.02.2011 | 04.10.2011 | formand |
Henrik Lund-Nielsen | 08.06.2006 | 27.08.2007 | bestyrelse |
Christian Henri Leroy | 08.06.2006 | 27.08.2007 | formand |
Karsten Rasmussen | 08.06.2006 | 27.07.2007 | bestyrelse |