Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
René Ravn | 31.05.2006 | 23.04.2007 | direktion |
Henrik Korsholm Jeppesen | 31.05.2006 | 23.04.2007 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Peter Lillevang Dalsberg | 25.04.2016 | 23.09.2016 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
René Munk-Nissen | 25.04.2016 | 23.09.2016 | formand |
Lars Ole Petersen | 29.04.2010 | 23.09.2016 | bestyrelse |
René Munk-Nissen | 30.04.2007 | 24.04.2016 | bestyrelse |
Peter Lillevang Dalsberg | 30.04.2007 | 24.04.2016 | formand |
Frederik Toft | 30.04.2007 | 29.04.2010 | bestyrelse |