Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Carl Kruse Andersen | 22.05.2012 | 23.11.2017 | bestyrelse |
Jan Carsten Hansen | 06.05.2010 | 23.11.2017 | bestyrelse |
Nicolai Frisch Erichsen | 25.05.2009 | 22.05.2012 | bestyrelse |
Jesper Christensen | 31.03.2008 | 23.11.2017 | bestyrelse |
Johannes Møller Westh | 31.03.2008 | 17.07.2010 | bestyrelse |
Charlotte Sager | 31.03.2008 | 25.05.2009 | bestyrelse |
Per Bodé | 22.05.2006 | 31.03.2008 | bestyrelse |
Henning Harding Hansen | 22.05.2006 | 31.03.2008 | bestyrelse |
Tom Taaning Petersen | 22.05.2006 | 31.03.2008 | bestyrelse |