Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Brian Icedor Petersen | 27.05.2010 | 18.03.2011 | bestyrelse |
Lone Hansen | 29.05.2008 | 25.03.2011 | formand |
Niels Bent Hansen | 29.05.2008 | 18.03.2011 | bestyrelse |
Morten Krogh Jensen | 08.05.2008 | 27.05.2010 | bestyrelse |
Karsten Lind | 07.04.2006 | 08.05.2008 | bestyrelse |