Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Hother Hennings | 15.03.2006 | 30.05.2011 | direktion |
Dorthe Bengtsen Skaanning Olesen | 15.03.2006 | 31.03.2007 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Erik Hennings | 01.04.2007 | 30.05.2011 | formand |
Hother Hennings | 15.03.2006 | 30.05.2011 | bestyrelse |
Ole Skaanning Olesen | 15.03.2006 | 31.03.2007 | formand |